This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 02/04/2022 at 06:01:09 (UTC).

THE HERTZ CORPORATION VS HONEYCUTT, DANIEL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 THE HERTZ CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HONEYCUTT, DANIEL. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Defendant

HONEYCUTT, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUTLIFFE, CHERYL J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

01/05/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

01/05/2022:Complaint

Notice Designating Email Address

01/05/2022:Notice Designating Email Address

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/05/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

01/06/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON DANIEL HONEYCUTT 011122

01/12/2022:Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON DANIEL HONEYCUTT 011122

Response TO SUMMONS FILED BY DANIEL HONEYCUTT

01/27/2022:Response TO SUMMONS FILED BY DANIEL HONEYCUTT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse TO SUMMONS FILED BY DANIEL HONEYCUTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON DANIEL HONEYCUTT 011122

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA000031CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 1/5/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cutliffe, Cheryl J