This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/10/2021 at 08:31:08 (UTC).

TELFER, PAMELA A VS TELFER-JONES, JAMES ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 TELFER, PAMELA A filed an Other lawsuit against TELFER-JONES, JAMES ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TELFER, PAMELA A

Defendant

TELFER-JONES, JAMES ALEXANDER

Not Classified By Court

TELFER, PAMELA

TELFER-JONES, JAMES

TELFER, PAM

TELFER-JONES, JAMES A

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

10/11/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint on Unlawful Detainer

10/11/2021:Complaint on Unlawful Detainer

Disclosure From Non Lawyer

10/11/2021:Disclosure From Non Lawyer

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF

10/11/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF

Return of Service on Summons Served PAMELA TELFER 101221 / POSTED

10/19/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served PAMELA TELFER 101221 / POSTED

Motion For Default On JAMES ALEXANDER TELFER-JONES

10/28/2021:Motion For Default On JAMES ALEXANDER TELFER-JONES

Motion For Default Judgment

10/28/2021:Motion For Default Judgment

Notice of Hearing BLANK FILED BY PL

10/28/2021:Notice of Hearing BLANK FILED BY PL

Default Entered

11/09/2021:Default Entered

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing BLANK FILED BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On JAMES ALEXANDER TELFER-JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served PAMELA TELFER 101221 / POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point JRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclosure From Non Lawyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint on Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CC003959CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less