This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 09/26/2022 at 09:40:00 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA VS NEWMAN, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 TD BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEWMAN, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA

Defendant

NEWMAN, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

09/20/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

09/20/2022:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

09/20/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued 113022 AT 10AM, JENNIFER NEWMAN

09/22/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued 113022 AT 10AM, JENNIFER NEWMAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/30/2022 10:00; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: Robert D Sumner Judicial Cente DC Cou

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued 113022 AT 10AM, JENNIFER NEWMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase 512022SC004534SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J