Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/06/2019 at 08:31:12 (UTC).

TAH MS BORROWER LLC VS THOMPSON, SHANNA

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 TAH MS BORROWER LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against THOMPSON, SHANNA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAH MS BORROWER LLC

Defendant

THOMPSON, SHANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMILLAN, JOHN EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Order To Disburse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • File Verified To This Point KA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Motion For Default On AS TO COUNT I ON SHANNA THOMPSON AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION, FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED ORDER OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Returned Mail SHANNA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Motion For COURT Default On SHANNA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Notice of Hearing 043019 AT 145PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Default Denied AGAINST SHANNA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Motion For Default On (COURTS) DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service AND VERIFICATION OF CLAIM, SHANNA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Motion For Default On SHANNA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service SHANNA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 040419 SHANNA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Response AND REQUEST FOR HEARING FILED BY SHANNA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, SHANNA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 512019CC001363CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAH MS BORROWER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN E McMILLAN