Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/29/2019 at 19:13:11 (UTC).

SYROP, LEROY Et Al VS MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2011 SYROP, LEROY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SYROP, LEROY

SYROP, YUPIN

Defendants

THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT

MACLEISH, ROBERT F JR

SISTRUNK, DANIELLE

MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR, J W

Defendant Attorneys

BERK, WILLIAM STEWART

BLACKWELL, SARA KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice OF DEFS MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY INC. AND ROBERT F. MACLEISH, JR., W/ATT JOINT STIPULATION

03/20/2014:Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice OF DEFS MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY INC. AND ROBERT F. MACLEISH, JR., W/ATT JOINT STIPULATION

Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO DEF THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON, ETC., W/ATT JOINT STIPULATION

03/18/2014:Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO DEF THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON, ETC., W/ATT JOINT STIPULATION

Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTFS

09/26/2013:Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTFS

Request For Admissions FILED BY THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO VP10078, MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., ROBERT F. MACLEISH JR., DANIELLE SISTRUNK

09/13/2013:Request For Admissions FILED BY THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO VP10078, MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., ROBERT F. MACLEISH JR., DANIELLE SISTRUNK

Request For Production THIRD

05/29/2013:Request For Production THIRD

Request For Production DEFENDANTS' THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

05/23/2013:Request For Production DEFENDANTS' THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

Notice Of Hearing

05/23/2013:Notice Of Hearing

Notice Of Hearing 052013 AT 1000AM

05/21/2013:Notice Of Hearing 052013 AT 1000AM

Notice Of Hearing 062113 AT 900AM

05/20/2013:Notice Of Hearing 062113 AT 900AM

Notice Of Hearing 053113 AT 1100AM

05/07/2013:Notice Of Hearing 053113 AT 1100AM

Notice Of Hearing 053113 AT 1100AM

05/01/2013:Notice Of Hearing 053113 AT 1100AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice OF DEFS MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY INC. AND ROBERT F. MACLEISH, JR., W/ATT JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Joint Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFS MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY INC AND ROBERT F. MACLEISH, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • MACLEISH INSURANCE AGENCY INC dismissed 3/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • ROBERT F MACLEISH JR dismissed 3/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO DEF THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON, ETC., W/ATT JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Joint Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEF "THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON, ETC."

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON dismissed 3/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • Notice OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
248 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2011
  • NTC OF APPEARANCE - CIVIL; THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • ASM:CA FF GENERAL; B143458; $400.00; SYROP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • ASM:CA SUMMONS ISSUED; B143458; $10.00; SYROP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • FILING OPENED FOR SRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; SYROP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • COMPLAINT:; SYROP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; SYROP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO PROCESS SERVER; THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • PMT:CA FF GENERAL; B143458; $400.00; SYROP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • PMT:CA SUMMONS ISSUED; B143458; $10.00; SYROP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Stewart Berk