This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/04/2019 at 00:11:22 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS MORRIS, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORRIS, RICHARD. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

MORRIS, RICHARD

Not Classified By Court

SYNCHRONY BANK WALMART MC

SECOND ROUND LP

SNYCHRONY BANK AMAZON.COM STOR

SYNCHRONY BANK PAYPAL EXTRAS M

SYNCHRONY BANK HH GREGG

SYNCHRONY BANK LOWES CONSUMER

SYNCHRONY BANK HAVERTYS

SYNCHRONY BANK CAR CARE ONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 112519 @2:30 PM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 112519 @2:30 PM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • File Verified To This Point SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Case 512019SC004271SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Event Date: 11/25/2019 14:30; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less