This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/29/2019 at 00:10:54 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS MEZO, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEZO, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

MEZO, JOSEPH

Not Classified By Court

SYNCHRONY BANK WALMART MC

SECOND ROUND LP

MEZO, JOSEPH L

SNYCHRONY BANK AMAZON.COM STOR

SYNCHRONY BANK PAYPAL EXTRAS M

SYNCHRONY BANK HH GREGG

SYNCHRONY BANK LOWES CONSUMER

SYNCHRONY BANK HAVERTYS

SYNCHRONY BANK CAR CARE ONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/24/2019:Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVER 111819 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • File Verified To This Point YA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Case 512019SC004084SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Event Date: 11/18/2019 11:00; Judge: GREY, FRANK I; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less