This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/04/2019 at 00:14:07 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS DIAZ, SULY

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIAZ, SULY. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

DIAZ, SULY

Not Classified By Court

SYNCHRONY BANK WALMART MC

SECOND ROUND LP

SNYCHRONY BANK AMAZON.COM STOR

SYNCHRONY BANK PAYPAL EXTRAS M

SYNCHRONY BANK HH GREGG

SYNCHRONY BANK LOWES CONSUMER

SYNCHRONY BANK HAVERTYS

SYNCHRONY BANK CAR CARE ONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUILES, MICHELLE MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/18/19 @ 9:00AM; SULY DIAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Case 512019SC004270SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Event Date: 12/18/2019 09:00; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B

    Read MoreRead Less