This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/04/2019 at 00:12:45 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS BERNYS, DARYL Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BERNYS, DARYL. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendants

KOSNIKOWSKI, DANIEL E

BERNYS, DARYL

Not Classified By Court

SYNCHRONY BANK WALMART MC

SECOND ROUND LP

SNYCHRONY BANK AMAZON.COM STOR

SYNCHRONY BANK PAYPAL EXTRAS M

BERNYS, DARYL D

SYNCHRONY BANK HH GREGG

SYNCHRONY BANK LOWES CONSUMER

SYNCHRONY BANK HAVERTYS

SYNCHRONY BANK CAR CARE ONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/18/19 @ 9:00AM; DARYL BERNYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/18/19 @ 9:00AM; DANIEL E KOSNIKOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Complaint W/EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Case 512019SC004248SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Event Date: 12/18/2019 09:00; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B

    Read MoreRead Less