This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 00:14:24 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS AMENGUAL, RAFAEL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMENGUAL, RAFAEL. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

AMENGUAL, RAFAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

01/19/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

01/19/2022:Complaint

Pretrial Notice/Summons to be Issued

01/19/2022:Pretrial Notice/Summons to be Issued

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 041422 @ 2:30 PM

01/28/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 041422 @ 2:30 PM

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ON RAFAEL AMENGUAL 020822 NMA

02/09/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ON RAFAEL AMENGUAL 020822 NMA

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/14/2022 14:30; Judge: ANDERSON, DUSTIN; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ON RAFAEL AMENGUAL 020822 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 041422 @ 2:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPretrial Notice/Summons to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase 512022SC000334SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 1/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J