This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:30:31 (UTC).

SUN THREE LAKES LLC VS DOE, JOHN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 SUN THREE LAKES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOE, JOHN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I II and GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I II

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN THREE LAKES LLC

Defendants

LOTHRIDGE, CHRISTOPHER

DOE, JOHN

ROLDAN, SAVONNAH

Not Classified By Court

THREE LAKES RV RESORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHASE, BRIAN CHRISTIAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/17/2020:Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDefault Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST CHRISTOPHER LOTHRIDGE, SAVONNAH ROLDAN AND JOHN DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served POSTED 092620 CHRISTOPHER LOTHRIDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served POSTED 092620 SAVONNAH ROLDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served POSTED 092620 JOHN DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase Progress Notes SUMMONS SUBMITTED HAS INCORRECT CLERK'S NAME LISTED THROUGHOUT- CORRECTED SUMMONS NEEDED IN ORDER TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketExhibit EXHIBIT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketExhibit EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002494CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less