This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 07:15:58 (UTC).

STONE, DONALD L, STONE, STEVE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 STONE, DONALD L, STONE, STEVE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

STONE, STEVE A

STONE, STEVE

Decedent

STONE, DONALD L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

JONAS, STEVEN KEITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINIG HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND - ORIGINAL - $18,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE ORIGINAL RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketLetter of Clerk's Determination as to Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 6/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFormal Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative and Designation and Acceptance of Resident Agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketWaiver and Consent to Entry of Order Determining Homestead Status of Real Property SS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketWaiver and Consent to Entry of Order Determining Homestead Status of Real Property SS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Priority, Consent to Appointment of Personal Representative and Waiver of Notice and Bond SS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Priority, Consent to Appointment of Personal Representative and Waiver of Notice and Bond SS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPetition to Determine Homestead Status of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPetition to Waive Bond of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP000951CPAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONAS, STEVEN KEITH