This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/13/2019 at 08:31:41 (UTC).

STILLWELL, RITA VS BOTELHO, ROBERT Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 STILLWELL, RITA filed an Other lawsuit against BOTELHO, ROBERT. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STILLWELL, RITA

Defendants

VALENCIA STILLWELL, ASHLEY D

BOTELHO, ROBERT

STILLWELL, ASHLEY DANAE VALENC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILDEBRANDT, MICHAEL CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • File Verified To This Point BP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Notice of Hearing 061219 @200 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Answer FILED BY ROBERT BOTELHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service ASHLEY DANAE VALENCIA STILLWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service ROBERT BOTELHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 051519 ASHEY DANAE VALENCIA STILLWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 051519 ROBERT BOTELHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; ROBERT BOTELHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; ASHLEY DANAE VALENCIA STILLWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Complaint on Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Case 512019CC001905CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 5/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILDEBRANDT , MICHAEL CHARLES, I