This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/26/2019 at 14:59:34 (UTC).

STEFOPOULOS, ANTONIA P VS STEFOPOULOS, TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 STEFOPOULOS, ANTONIA P filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEFOPOULOS, TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEFOPOULOS, ANTONIA P

Defendant

STEFOPOULOS, TIMOTHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage WITH ATTACHED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Order Setting MATTER FOR FINAL Hearing 012219 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Notice of Social Security Number FILED BY PETQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Certificate Of Completion ANTONIA PERGANTIS STEFOPOULOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • 2018 REAL ESTATE TAX NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • FAMILY LAW Financial Affidavit FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Waiver of Mandatory Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2018
  • Order For Temporary Standing Child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Order To Attend Parenting Class

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Case 512018DR005686DRAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/1/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Family Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage W/EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Respondents Notice Of Social Security Number Confi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Copy of Drivers License FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Copy Of PASSPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Answer And Waiver AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less