Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/27/2019 at 12:18:44 (UTC).

STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I VS 84 LUMBER COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 84 LUMBER COMPANY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I

Defendants

84 LUMBER COMPANY

CREATIVE CONCEPTS PAINTING INC

FAITH PLASTERING AND STUCCO IN

SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS I

BAILLIE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLS, JAMES MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

HARRIGAN, DAVID S

SKRZYSOWSKI PITTMAN, JAYNE ANN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Production from Non Party

01/17/2019:Notice of Production from Non Party

Alias Summons Returned Served ON FAITH PLASTERING AND STUCCO INC 111717

12/27/2017:Alias Summons Returned Served ON FAITH PLASTERING AND STUCCO INC 111717

Request For Admissions FILED BY 84 LUMBER COMPANY

12/01/2017:Request For Admissions FILED BY 84 LUMBER COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTY ON FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO, INC.

11/09/2017:SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTY ON FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

09/13/2017:SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON CREATIVE CONCEPTS PAINTING INC

09/13/2017:SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON CREATIVE CONCEPTS PAINTING INC

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY

09/13/2017:SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO INC

09/13/2017:SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO INC

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON BAILLIE ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

09/13/2017:SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON BAILLIE ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice of Non Availability FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Production from Non Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice Designating Email Address (SECOND AMENDED) OBO SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Request For Copies FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Notice of Production from Non Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Order For Substitution Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Notice Designating Email Address JAYNE PITTMAN ESQ OBO SUTTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Notice Of Appearance ANTHONY HORRNIK ESQ OBO SUTTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel CARLTON FIELDS OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES OBO STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON CREATIVE CONCEPTS PAINTING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY ON BAILLIE ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Case 512017CA001801CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/2/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAILLIE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTI is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS I is a litigant

Latest cases where FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where 84 Lumber Company is a litigant