Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/25/2019 at 23:14:38 (UTC).

STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I VS 84 LUMBER COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2016 STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 84 LUMBER COMPANY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I

Defendants

84 LUMBER COMPANY

MASTERED PAINT AND DECORATING

SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS I

BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING AND CONS

DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORD, TIMOTHY CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

THORN, ERIC MICHAEL

SKRZYSOWSKI PITTMAN, JAYNE ANN

SHOWEN, ANDREW VANCE

 

Court Documents

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY ,ASTERED PAINT & DECORATING INC

06/15/2018:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY ,ASTERED PAINT & DECORATING INC

Notice Designating Email Address DEF

05/16/2018:Notice Designating Email Address DEF

Notice Designating Email Add OBO SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

07/19/2017:Notice Designating Email Add OBO SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

Request For Admissions FILED BY DEF, 84 LUMBER COMPANY

06/29/2017:Request For Admissions FILED BY DEF, 84 LUMBER COMPANY

Response to Motion (AMENDED) (IN OPPOSITION) TO DISMISS FILED BY PLTF

04/19/2017:Response to Motion (AMENDED) (IN OPPOSITION) TO DISMISS FILED BY PLTF

Response to Motion (IN OPPOSITION) TO DISMISS OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLTF

04/18/2017:Response to Motion (IN OPPOSITION) TO DISMISS OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLTF

Motion TO DISMISS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY 84 LUMBER COMPANY

04/11/2017:Motion TO DISMISS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY 84 LUMBER COMPANY

Summons Returned Served 031317 BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC.

04/06/2017:Summons Returned Served 031317 BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC.

Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY ANDREW V SHOWEN ESQ OBO DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

04/06/2017:Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY ANDREW V SHOWEN ESQ OBO DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

Summons Returned Served 031317 SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC.

03/29/2017:Summons Returned Served 031317 SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC.

Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS

03/24/2017:Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS

Notice Designating Email Add FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

03/24/2017:Notice Designating Email Add FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

Notice Designating Email Add FILED BY DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

03/24/2017:Notice Designating Email Add FILED BY DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

Summons Returned Served 030817 84 LUMBER COMPANY

03/21/2017:Summons Returned Served 030817 84 LUMBER COMPANY

Notice Of Appearance OBO MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING INC

03/20/2017:Notice Of Appearance OBO MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

02/28/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY CORPORATE CREATIONS NETWORK INC

02/28/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY CORPORATE CREATIONS NETWORK INC

Civil Cover Sheet

12/28/2016:Civil Cover Sheet

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice of Non Availability FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice Designating Email Address (THIRD AMENDED) OBO SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Response To Request Production FILED BY DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Request For Production DEPENABLE STUCCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To DEPENABLE STUCCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Request For Production DEPENDABLE STUCCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Response To Request For Admissions TO DEPENDABLE STUCCO

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Appearance OBO MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY CORPORATE CREATIONS NETWORK INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON B&D PAINTING INC. BRUCE MONIGOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Case 512016CA004059CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 12/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint W/EXHIBITS 1 - 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASTERED PAINT AND DECORATING is a litigant

Latest cases where BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING AND CONS is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPENDABLE STUCCO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS I is a litigant