Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/24/2019 at 23:02:25 (UTC).

STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I VS 84 LUMBER COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2016 STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 84 LUMBER COMPANY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I

Defendants

84 LUMBER COMPANY

NICE CLEANING AND PAINTING INC

BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING AND CONS

FAITH PLASTERING STUCCO AND DR

SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SKRZYSOWSKI PITTMAN, JAYNE ANN

WALLS, JAMES MICHAEL

RODRIGUEZ, PEDRO WILSON

HARRIGAN, DAVID S

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF

08/29/2017:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF

Response To Request Production FILED BY PLTF

08/29/2017:Response To Request Production FILED BY PLTF

Request For Admissions FILED BY 84 LUMBER COMPANY

06/30/2017:Request For Admissions FILED BY 84 LUMBER COMPANY

Notice Designating Email Add FILED BY COUNSEL FOR SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

06/23/2017:Notice Designating Email Add FILED BY COUNSEL FOR SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

Motion TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY NICE CLEANING AND PAINTING INC

04/14/2017:Motion TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY NICE CLEANING AND PAINTING INC

Summons Returned Served BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC BRADFORD B MCDONALD 031317

04/12/2017:Summons Returned Served BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC BRADFORD B MCDONALD 031317

Summons Returned Served ON BRAD MACDONALD ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC 031317

04/06/2017:Summons Returned Served ON BRAD MACDONALD ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC 031317

Summons Returned Served 032517 NICE CLEANING & PAINTING INC.

03/30/2017:Summons Returned Served 032517 NICE CLEANING & PAINTING INC.

Summons Returned Served SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC; 031317

03/28/2017:Summons Returned Served SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC; 031317

Summons Returned Served FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO INC; 031317

03/28/2017:Summons Returned Served FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO INC; 031317

Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO SUTTON CONRACTING SOLUTIONS

03/24/2017:Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO SUTTON CONRACTING SOLUTIONS

Summons Returned Served ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY 030817

03/21/2017:Summons Returned Served ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY 030817

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, INC

02/28/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON NICE CLEANING & PAINTING INC

02/28/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON NICE CLEANING & PAINTING INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO INC

02/28/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

02/28/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

Order Granting PLTF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

01/03/2017:Order Granting PLTF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

Complaint

08/23/2016:Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC dismissed 2/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • FAITH PLASTERING STUCCO AND DRYWALL INC dismissed 2/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice AS TO SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Motion for Enforcement DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Order APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Notice Of Appearance OBO STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Notice Of Appearance AS CO COUNSEL OBO STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY 84 LUMBER CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY CORPORATE CREATIONS NETWORK INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting PLTF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Case 512016CA002771CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 8/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING AND CONS is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS I is a litigant

Latest cases where FAITH PLASTERING & STUCCO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where 84 Lumber Company is a litigant