Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/24/2019 at 20:38:35 (UTC).

STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I VS 84 LUMBER COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2016 STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 84 LUMBER COMPANY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANDARD PACIFIC OF TAMPA GP I

Defendants

84 LUMBER COMPANY

MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING, I

SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS,

DEPENDABLE STUCCO, LLC

Decedent

BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLS, JAMES MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

THORN, ERIC MICHAEL

HORRNIK, ANTHONY M

SKRZYSOWSKI PITTMAN, JAYNE ANN

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Appearance JAMES WALLS ESQ OBO PLTF

06/12/2018:Notice Of Appearance JAMES WALLS ESQ OBO PLTF

Request For Admissions (84 LUMBERS) UPON PLTF

06/29/2017:Request For Admissions (84 LUMBERS) UPON PLTF

Response to Motion (IN OPPOSITION) TO DISMISS FILED BY PLTF

04/19/2017:Response to Motion (IN OPPOSITION) TO DISMISS FILED BY PLTF

Response to Motion (AMENDED) (IN OPPOSITION) TO DISMISS FILED BY PLTF

04/19/2017:Response to Motion (AMENDED) (IN OPPOSITION) TO DISMISS FILED BY PLTF

Motion TO DISMISS COUNTS V, VI AND VII, FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

04/14/2017:Motion TO DISMISS COUNTS V, VI AND VII, FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

04/14/2017:Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

Summons Returned Served 031317 BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.

04/06/2017:Summons Returned Served 031317 BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Summons Returned Served 031317 MASTERED PAINT & DECORATION INC.

04/06/2017:Summons Returned Served 031317 MASTERED PAINT & DECORATION INC.

Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, FILED BY ATTY OBO DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

04/06/2017:Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, FILED BY ATTY OBO DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

Summons Returned Served 031317 DEPENDABLE STUCCO

03/29/2017:Summons Returned Served 031317 DEPENDABLE STUCCO

Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS

03/24/2017:Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS

Notice Designating Email Add FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS

03/24/2017:Notice Designating Email Add FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS

Summons Returned Served ON 84 LUMBERT CO 030817

03/23/2017:Summons Returned Served ON 84 LUMBERT CO 030817

Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING, INC.

03/20/2017:Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING, INC.

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

02/28/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY

02/28/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTION INC

02/28/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTION INC

Order Granting PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

11/16/2016:Order Granting PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice of Non Availability FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories AND OBJECTIONS FILED BY DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Response To Request Production FILED BY DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Order For Substitution Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To DEPENDABLE STUCCO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Request To Produce FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Notice Designating Email Address (SECOND AMENDED) FILED BY SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial FILED BY MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Appearance JAMES WALLS ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON 84 LUMBER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY ON MASTERED PAINT & DECORATING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Case 512016CA002652CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASTERED PAINT AND DECORATING is a litigant

Latest cases where BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING AND CONS is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPENDABLE STUCCO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS I is a litigant