Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/27/2019 at 23:08:58 (UTC).

SFAKIOS, AMY VS AAFROST LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2017 SFAKIOS, AMY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AAFROST LLC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFAKIOS, AMY

Defendants

FLORIDA ALLIANCE INC

AAFROST LLC

Garnishees

REGIONS BANK

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPA

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Not Classified By Court

REGIONS MORTGAGE

COLONIAL BANK

FL ALLIANCE INC

WACHOVIA BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPIRO, PETER E.

Defendant Attorney

CHAMPAGNE, MELISSA NICOLE

Garnishee Attorneys

HENDRIX, DAVID STOCKTON

KENT, JOHN BRADFORD

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF

01/23/2018:Final Judgment IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF

Notice of Hearing 012318 AT 830AM

12/18/2017:Notice of Hearing 012318 AT 830AM

Default Entered AGAINST FLORIDA ALLIANCE INC

10/27/2017:Default Entered AGAINST FLORIDA ALLIANCE INC

Summons Issued And Returned To AAFROST LLC ISSUED ATTY

09/19/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To AAFROST LLC ISSUED ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To FLORIDA ALLIANCE INC ISSUED ATTY

09/19/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To FLORIDA ALLIANCE INC ISSUED ATTY

Civil Cover Sheet

08/29/2017:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/29/2017:Complaint

Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

08/29/2017:Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

08/29/2017:Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • Answer of Garnishee FILED BY COUNSEL OBO GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Writ of Garnishment Returned Served WELLS FARGO 032618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Answer of Garnishee FILED BY BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Answer OF GARNISHEE REGIONS BANK TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Correspondence FROM COUNSEL TO CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Writ of Garnishment TO WELLS FARGO BANK NA ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Writ of Garnishment TO REGIONS BANK ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Writ of Garnishment TO BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Copy Of UNISSUED WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Copy Of UNISSUED WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2017
  • Return of Service on Summons Served FLORIDA ALLIANCE INC; 092617

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To AAFROST LLC ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To FLORIDA ALLIANCE INC ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Case 512017CA002798CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • File Verified To This Point MFC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA ALLIANCE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Colonial Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Wachovia Bank, National Assn is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Mortgage is a litigant