This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:01:56 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, MARIA VS DIGGS, DEVIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 SANCHEZ, MARIA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DIGGS, DEVIN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SESTAK, WILLIAM G and COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SESTAK, WILLIAM G

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, MARIA

Defendants

DIGGS, PATRICIA

DIGGS, DEVIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing 121218 AT 430PM

12/03/2018:Notice of Hearing 121218 AT 430PM

Response FILED BY PATRICIA DIGGS

11/30/2018:Response FILED BY PATRICIA DIGGS

Summons Returned Served POSTED 110618 PATRICIA DIGGS

11/13/2018:Summons Returned Served POSTED 110618 PATRICIA DIGGS

Complaint FOR EVICTION

11/05/2018:Complaint FOR EVICTION

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; PATRICIA DIGGS

11/05/2018:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; PATRICIA DIGGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • Case Progress Notes *FILE IN COURT FILE UNSIGNED - PARTIES ENTERED INTO STIPULATION*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Copy Of Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Order APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • File Verified To This Point YA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Default Denied AGAINST PATRICIA DIGGS *PARTY FILED PAPER*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Default Entered AGAINST DEVIN DIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Motion For COURT'S Default On PATRICIA DIGGS AND DEVIN DIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2018
  • Affidavit As To Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing 121218 AT 430PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Response FILED BY PATRICIA DIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED 110618 DAVIN DIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED 110618 PATRICIA DIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; DEVIN DIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; PATRICIA DIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Case 512018CC004423CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/5/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Event Date: 12/12/2018 14:00; Judge: SESTAK, WILLIAM G; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: ES D

    Read MoreRead Less