This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/30/2022 at 15:30:53 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, ERIKA, SMITH, TAMMY Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 SANCHEZ, ERIKA, SMITH, TAMMY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SANCHEZ, ERIKA

Decedent

SMITH, TAMMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KOUSKOUTIS, NOMIKOS MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOrder Admitting Will And Appointment Of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase Status Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL Death Certificate For DECEDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketLast Will And Testament

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketClerk Review of Formal Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDeath Certificate Copy FOR DECEDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketOath Of Personal Representative Or Designated Registered Agent and Acceptance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPetition For Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CP001830CPAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less