Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/02/2019 at 08:31:05 (UTC).

SALVATO, STEPHEN VS AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 SALVATO, STEPHEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALVATO, STEPHEN

Defendants

MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF A

AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAYNOR, MORGAN LUKE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Case 512019CC001310CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Complaint AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Exhibit C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Exhibit A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Exhibit B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Exhibit D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Exhibit E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercury Indemnity Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORGAN L GAYNOR, ESQ