Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/06/2019 at 00:12:51 (UTC).

RYNARD, JEFF VS FOREST RIVER INC

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 RYNARD, JEFF filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FOREST RIVER INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYNARD, JEFF

Defendant

FOREST RIVER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GLENN, JOHN JASON

 

Court Documents

Statement Of Claim; RYNARD JEFF

04/01/2019:Statement Of Claim; RYNARD JEFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance OBO FOREST RIVER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice Designating Email Address OBO FOREST RIVER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 512019SC001477SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim; RYNARD JEFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 06/19/2019 @ 3:30 PM; FOREST RIVER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Event Date: 06/19/2019 15:30; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B; Defendant Attorney: GLENN, JOHN J

    Read MoreRead Less