This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:10:19 (UTC).

RUJDER Y AND Y LLC VS VALLADARES, JULISSA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 RUJDER Y AND Y LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against VALLADARES, JULISSA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUJDER Y AND Y LLC

Defendants

VALLADARES, JULISSA

VIDAL, RENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRETT, CHARLES VINCENT

 

Court Documents

Complaint W/ATTACHMENT

11/08/2018:Complaint W/ATTACHMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal AS TO COUNT II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 121718 RENE VIDAL AND JULLISSA VALLADARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Default Entered RENE VIDAL AND JULISSA VALLADARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Motion For Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS; RENE VIDAL AND JULISSA VALLADARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served RENE VIDAL 111618; POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served JULISSA VALLADARES 111618; POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service RENE VIDAL AND JULISSA VALLADARES; NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; JULISSA VALLADARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; RENE VIDAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Case 512018CC004502CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2018

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.