Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/07/2019 at 08:32:09 (UTC).

ROYAL RICHEY VILLAGE I CONDOMI VS DRIS RALPH M UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 ROYAL RICHEY VILLAGE I CONDOMI filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DRIS RALPH M UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROYAL RICHEY VILLAGE I CONDOMI

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANTS

DRIS, RALPH M

DRIS RALPH M UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULLIS, BRANDON K

 

Court Documents

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

04/08/2019:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

Summons Issued And Returned To RALPH M DRIS

04/10/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To RALPH M DRIS

Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RALH M DRIS

04/10/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RALH M DRIS

Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN TENANTS

04/10/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN TENANTS

Return of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RALPH M DRIS

05/01/2019:Return of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RALPH M DRIS

Return of Service on Summons Unserved FOR DEFENDANT/ UNKNOWN TENANTS

04/29/2019:Return of Service on Summons Unserved FOR DEFENDANT/ UNKNOWN TENANTS

Return of Service on Summons Served 042619 RALPH M DRIS

05/01/2019:Return of Service on Summons Served 042619 RALPH M DRIS

Notice of Discharge/Cancellation of Lis Pendens FILED BY BRANDON K MULLIS ESQ OBO PLTF

11/19/2019:Notice of Discharge/Cancellation of Lis Pendens FILED BY BRANDON K MULLIS ESQ OBO PLTF

Notice Of Lis Pendens

04/02/2019:Notice Of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 042619 RALPH M DRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RALPH M DRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Unserved FOR DEFENDANT/ UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To RALPH M DRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RALH M DRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Case 512019CC001372CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Complaint W/EXHIBITS A - C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLIS , BRANDON K