Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 03/17/2021 at 06:02:08 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, MARIA VS CRAWFORD, KEITH Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 RODRIGUEZ, MARIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRAWFORD, KEITH. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARTHLE, SUSAN G and BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ, MARIA

Defendants

CRAWFORD, LORI

CRAWFORD, KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAINZ, ROBERT RYAN

 

Court Documents

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

02/15/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

02/15/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories LORI CRAWFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories KEITH CRAWFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketRequest For Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketRequest For Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketRequest To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketRequest To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA000345CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 2/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer R RYAN SAINZ