Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/26/2019 at 15:39:09 (UTC).

ROBERTSON, CHRISTOPHER M VS MAULDIN, JESSICA L

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 ROBERTSON, CHRISTOPHER M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MAULDIN, JESSICA L. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON, CHRISTOPHER M

Defendant

MAULDIN, JESSICA L

Not Classified By Court

ROBERTSON, CHRISTOPHER MI

ROBERTSON, CHRISTOPHER 25

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • BVS Electronically Reported to Vital Statistics

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Financial Affidavit JESSICA L MAULDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Answer TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Waiver of Mandatory Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Returned Mail JESSICA L MAULDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Change Of Address PET CHRISTOPHER ROBERTSON

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • Vital Statistics Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service OF JESSICA L MAULDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Affidavit Of Diligent Search AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE MANPOWER SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Action By Posting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Disclosure From Non Lawyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Affidavit and/or Application for Indigency Status CHRISTOPHER ROBERTSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Clerk Approved Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less