This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/19/2019 at 08:31:38 (UTC).

RIVER BEND PARK VILLAGE VS ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 RIVER BEND PARK VILLAGE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVER BEND PARK VILLAGE

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

DOUGLAS, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Final Hearing 043019 10:30AM

03/26/2019:Order Setting Final Hearing 043019 10:30AM

Summons Issued And Returned To PL FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

03/15/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PL FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY RIVER BEND PARK VILLAGE

04/15/2019:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY RIVER BEND PARK VILLAGE

Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

03/15/2019:Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

Summons Issued And Returned To PL FOR RICHARD DOUGLAS

03/15/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PL FOR RICHARD DOUGLAS

Order TO POST RENT

03/26/2019:Order TO POST RENT

Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

03/26/2019:Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

Answer FILED BY MATT DOUGLAS

03/22/2019:Answer FILED BY MATT DOUGLAS

Summons Returned Served RICHARD DOUGLAS 031519

03/19/2019:Summons Returned Served RICHARD DOUGLAS 031519

Summons Returned Served ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS 031519

03/19/2019:Summons Returned Served ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS 031519

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • Check Request Submitted For Approval 585.00 RIVER BEND PARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY RIVER BEND PARK VILLAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Motion TO DISBURSE FUNDS FILED BY RIVER BEND PARK VILLAGE; ORDER TO DISBURSE PREVIEIOUSLY ENTERED ON 3/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Disbursement Of Registry Deposit Monies CK#32682 $925.00 RIVER BEND PARK VILLAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Check Request Submitted For Approval RIVERBEND PARK VILLAGE 925.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order TO POST RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Order Setting Final Hearing 043019 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer FILED BY MATT DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served RICHARD DOUGLAS 031519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS 031519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Case 512019CC001087CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PL FOR RICHARD DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PL FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less