This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/29/2021 at 22:17:04 (UTC).

RIESENBECK, CINDY Et Al VS NEIDLEIN, DANIEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 RIESENBECK, CINDY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against NEIDLEIN, DANIEL. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POLK, ALICIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POLK, ALICIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIESENBECK, CINDY

RIESENBECK, GARY

Defendants

NEIDLEIN, DANIEL

RIESENBECK, JACALYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUD, TIMOTHY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

ALVERO, KHARA A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Appear for Case Management Conference 020222 AT 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss PETITION FOR TEMP CUSTODY OF MINOR CHILD BY EXTENDED FAMILY FILED BY RESP FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 09/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To DANIEL NEIDLEIN RET ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCase Progress Notes $10.00 SUMMONS FEE DUE TO BE ABLE TO ISSUE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDomestic Relations/Family Law Case Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on AUGUST 19, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing BIRTH CERTIFICATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketConsent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCopy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase 512021DR004088DRAXES Filed with Clerk on 8/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVERO , KHARA A.