Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/25/2019 at 22:12:18 (UTC).

RICE, LORI VS ENGLETT, MATTHEW Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2016 RICE, LORI filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ENGLETT, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICE, LORI

Defendants

MARLOWE, RUSSELL

MARLOWE, RUSSELL G

KAUFMAN ENGLETT AND LYND PA

RUSSELL G MARLOWE PA

ENGLETT, MATTHEW

ENGLETT, MATTHEW S

HOGUE, SHELLY

MARLOWE RUSSEL G PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITTEMORE, JASON KYLE

Defendant Attorneys

HERMAN, ADAM CRAIG

LOPEZ, JOS ENRIQUE

LOPEZ, JOS?? ENRIQUE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

06/06/2018:Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice Of Taking Deposition

06/04/2018:Notice Of Taking Deposition

Notice Of Appearance FEREEBORN & PETERS LLP OBO RUSSELL G MARLOWE PA

05/23/2018:Notice Of Appearance FEREEBORN & PETERS LLP OBO RUSSELL G MARLOWE PA

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY DEFS

05/23/2018:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY DEFS

Response To Request To Produce TO DEF RUSSELL G. MARLOWE. PA

05/23/2018:Response To Request To Produce TO DEF RUSSELL G. MARLOWE. PA

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

05/09/2018:Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY RUSSELL G MARLOWE PA AND RUSSELL MARLOWE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/13/2018:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY RUSSELL G MARLOWE PA AND RUSSELL MARLOWE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer And Affirmative Defense AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KAUFMAN ENGLETT AND LYND PA

04/09/2018:Answer And Affirmative Defense AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KAUFMAN ENGLETT AND LYND PA

Amended Complaint SECOND

02/28/2018:Amended Complaint SECOND

Summons Issued And Returned To RUSSELL MARLOWE ISSUED ATTY

01/30/2018:Summons Issued And Returned To RUSSELL MARLOWE ISSUED ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To RUSSELL G MARLOWE P.A. ISSUED ATTY

01/30/2018:Summons Issued And Returned To RUSSELL G MARLOWE P.A. ISSUED ATTY

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

01/17/2018:Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition (2ND AMENDED)

08/15/2017:Amended Notice of Taking Deposition (2ND AMENDED)

Answer And Affirmative Defense AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEF

02/13/2017:Answer And Affirmative Defense AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEF

Summons Issued And Returned To KAUFMAN ENGLETT AND LYND PA ISSUED ATTY

12/30/2016:Summons Issued And Returned To KAUFMAN ENGLETT AND LYND PA ISSUED ATTY

Civil Cover Sheet

12/19/2016:Civil Cover Sheet

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To TO DEF

12/19/2016:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To TO DEF

Request To Produce FILED BY PLF

12/19/2016:Request To Produce FILED BY PLF

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice PL AS TO KAUFMAN, ENGLETT AND LYND PA , SHELLY HOGUE AND MATTHEW S ENGLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Notice OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • MARLOWE RUSSEL G PA dismissed 8/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • RUSSELL MARLOWE dismissed 8/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice RUSSELL G MARLOWE PA AND RUSSELL MARLOWE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order STIPULATED PROTECTIVE AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2017
  • Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To KAUFMAN ENGLETT AND LYND PA ISSUED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • File Verified To This Point PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Case 512016CA003980CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To TO DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request To Produce FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Notice Designating Email Add FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAUFMAN, ENGLETT AND LYND CR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITTEMORE , JASON KYLE