This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/22/2019 at 08:32:04 (UTC).

RENTALS FIRST LLC VS ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 RENTALS FIRST LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENTALS FIRST LLC

Defendants

ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

WILLIAMS, TIFFANY

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served TIFFANY WILLIAMS 021619 (POSTED)

02/20/2019:Summons Returned Served TIFFANY WILLIAMS 021619 (POSTED)

Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

02/15/2019:Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER TIFFANY WILLIAMS

02/15/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER TIFFANY WILLIAMS

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

02/15/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 030819 TIFFANY WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Default Entered TIFFANY WILLIAMS AND ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served TIFFANY WILLIAMS 021619 (POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Summons Returned Served ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS 021619 (POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case 512019CC000678CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 2/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER TIFFANY WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less