Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/13/2019 at 08:31:10 (UTC).

REGIONAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIO VS BUTLER, HARRY BURTON Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 REGIONAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIO filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against BUTLER, HARRY BURTON. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIO

Defendants

BUTLER, HARRY BURTON

IMMEL, ROSA LEA

Not Classified By Court

BUTLER, HARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENIUS, WILLIAM JONATHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Replevin Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Writ Of Replevin PREJUDGMENT MAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Order AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ROSA LEA IMMEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To HARRY BURTON BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Notice FILED BY REGIONAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Petition FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To HARRY BURTON BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ROSA LEA IMMEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Case 512019CC001456CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Petition FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGIONAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J DENIUS