This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:31:52 (UTC).

RCJ HOPE LLC VS YOUNG, VALLARI

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 RCJ HOPE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YOUNG, VALLARI. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN and FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RCJ HOPE LLC

Defendants

YOUNG, VALLARI

YOUNG, VALLARI D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORNOST, VENESSA ESPERANZA

 

Court Documents

Answer VALLARI YOUNG

09/21/2020:Answer VALLARI YOUNG

Complaint for Eviction

09/17/2020:Complaint for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, FILED BY ATTY OBO PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCopy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing 101620 @ 11 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 091720 VALLARI D YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate Of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer VALLARI YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point GC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002476CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less