Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:17:48 (UTC).

QUALITY AUTO SALES OF FLORIDA Et Al VS DIAZ, RONNI

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 QUALITY AUTO SALES OF FLORIDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIAZ, RONNI. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SERRABELLA, JAMES C

QUALITY AUTO SALES OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DIAZ, RONNI

 

Court Documents

Copy Of Court Minutes

01/29/2019:Copy Of Court Minutes

Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

11/02/2018:Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

Summons Issued And Returned To PLAINTIFF/RONNI DIAZ 121718

11/02/2018:Summons Issued And Returned To PLAINTIFF/RONNI DIAZ 121718

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • Receipt EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order TRIAL SET 012219 AT 130PM HEARING ROOM 2E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 110318; DIAZ RONNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Case 512018SC003928SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/2/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLAINTIFF/RONNI DIAZ 121718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Event Date: 12/17/2018 14:30; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less