This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/14/2019 at 08:31:48 (UTC).

PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION OF VS ABOULHOSN RICKY UNKNOWN SPOUSE Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION OF filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ABOULHOSN RICKY UNKNOWN SPOUSE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION OF

Defendants

ABOULHOSN, RICKY

ABOULHOSN RICKY UNKNOWN SPOUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUFFMAN, WILLIAM WARD

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Lis Pendens

01/10/2019:Notice Of Lis Pendens

Satisfaction Of Judgment

06/21/2019:Satisfaction Of Judgment

Final Disposition Form

06/11/2019:Final Disposition Form

Motion For Summary Judgment AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PLTF

03/25/2019:Motion For Summary Judgment AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PLTF

Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

02/14/2019:Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 070219

05/03/2019:Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 070219

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

05/03/2019:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

Motion For Default On ON RICKY ABOULHOSN AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKY ABOULHOSN NKA ALYAA ABOULHOSN (CLERKS)

02/08/2019:Motion For Default On ON RICKY ABOULHOSN AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKY ABOULHOSN NKA ALYAA ABOULHOSN (CLERKS)

Summons Returned Served UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKEY ABOULHOSN

01/22/2019:Summons Returned Served UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKEY ABOULHOSN

Default Entered RICKY ABOULHOSN AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKY ABOUHOSN NKA ALYAA ABOULHOSN (CLERKS)

02/12/2019:Default Entered RICKY ABOULHOSN AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKY ABOUHOSN NKA ALYAA ABOULHOSN (CLERKS)

Default for Entry by Clerk

02/08/2019:Default for Entry by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKY ABOULHOSN

01/17/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKY ABOULHOSN

Summons Issued And Returned To RICKY ABOULHOSN

01/17/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To RICKY ABOULHOSN

Summons Returned Served RICKY ABOULHOSN 011819; NMA

01/22/2019:Summons Returned Served RICKY ABOULHOSN 011819; NMA

Affidavit As To Costs

03/25/2019:Affidavit As To Costs

Affidavit of Attorney Fees

03/25/2019:Affidavit of Attorney Fees

Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading G

03/25/2019:Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading G

Notice of Hearing 050319 AT 1030AM

04/01/2019:Notice of Hearing 050319 AT 1030AM

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/12/2019

DocketDefault Entered RICKY ABOULHOSN AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKY ABOUHOSN NKA ALYAA ABOULHOSN (CLERKS)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2019

DocketMotion For Default On ON RICKY ABOULHOSN AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKY ABOULHOSN NKA ALYAA ABOULHOSN (CLERKS)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2019

DocketDefault for Entry by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2019

DocketAffidavit of Service Served RICKY ABOULHOSN 011819; NMA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2019

DocketAffidavit of Service Served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2019

DocketSummons Issued And Returned To RICKY ABOULHOSN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2019

DocketSummons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICKY ABOULHOSN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketCase 512019CC000156CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 1/10/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketExhibit A1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketExhibit B1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketExhibit C1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketCopy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketCopy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketFile Verified To This Point CM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less