This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 08/06/2019 at 08:31:12 (UTC).

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER VS DUCHARME, CRAIG A Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DUCHARME, CRAIG A. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER

Defendants

DUCHARME, CRAIG A

WHITE, BRITTANY N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRETT, CHARLES VINCENT

 

Court Documents

Motion For Default On CRAIG A DUCHARME BRITTANY N WHITE

07/19/2019:Motion For Default On CRAIG A DUCHARME BRITTANY N WHITE

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER, CRAIG A DUCHARME

07/10/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER, CRAIG A DUCHARME

Return of Service on Summons Served BRITTNY N WHITE 07112019 @ 1:20 PM

07/19/2019:Return of Service on Summons Served BRITTNY N WHITE 07112019 @ 1:20 PM

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER, BRITTANY N WHITE

07/10/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER, BRITTANY N WHITE

Affidavit Of Non Military Service WENDY WALTER OBO CRAIG A DUCHARME AND BRITTANY N WHITE

07/19/2019:Affidavit Of Non Military Service WENDY WALTER OBO CRAIG A DUCHARME AND BRITTANY N WHITE

Default Denied (CLERKS) ON CRAIG A DUCHARME AND BRITTANY N WHITE *PARTIES FILED RESPONSE AND MONEY DEPOSITED IN REGISTRY*

07/24/2019:Default Denied (CLERKS) ON CRAIG A DUCHARME AND BRITTANY N WHITE *PARTIES FILED RESPONSE AND MONEY DEPOSITED IN REGISTRY*

Order To Disburse MONEY FROM THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT AND STIPULATION

08/07/2019:Order To Disburse MONEY FROM THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT AND STIPULATION

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

08/31/2020:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

07/02/2019:Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED ORDER TO DISBURSE MONEY FROM REGISTRY OF THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Correspondence TO ATTY FROM CLERK W/ATTACHED CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Settlement Agreement FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Default Denied (CLERKS) ON CRAIG A DUCHARME AND BRITTANY N WHITE *PARTIES FILED RESPONSE AND MONEY DEPOSITED IN REGISTRY*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY CHARLES V BARRETT, III OBO PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Motion For Default On CRAIG A DUCHARME BRITTANY N WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served BRITTANY N WHITE, 7112019 @ 1:20 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served BRITTNY N WHITE 07112019 @ 1:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service WENDY WALTER OBO CRAIG A DUCHARME AND BRITTANY N WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Response; BRITTANY WHITE AND CRAIG DUCHARME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER, BRITTANY N WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER, CRAIG A DUCHARME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case 512019CC002723CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES V BARRETT, III