This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/24/2019 at 06:01:25 (UTC).

POTH, STEVEN VS CARPENTER, MICHAEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 POTH, STEVEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARPENTER, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POTH, STEVEN

Defendants

CARPENTER, MICHAEL

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROZYNA, JONATHAN

Defendant Attorney

SWIHART, MATTHEW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • Response To Request For Admissions FILED BY GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Response To Request Production FILED BY GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Request For Admissions DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Request To Produce DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Notice DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance FILED BY MATTHEW SWIHART ESQ OBO GEICO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Amended Complaint PL

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • File Verified To This Point GC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case 512019CA000954CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Complaint W/EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To MICHAEL CARPENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY JONATHAN BROZYNA ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY JONATHAN BROZYNA ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request To Produce FILED BY JONATHAN BROZYNA ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request To Produce FILED BY JONATHAN BROZYNA ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less