This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 09/23/2022 at 10:02:56 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS MILER, SUMMER M

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MILER, SUMMER M. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

MILER, SUMMER M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

09/16/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

09/16/2022:Complaint

Pretrial Notice/Summons to be Issued

09/16/2022:Pretrial Notice/Summons to be Issued

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued SUMMER MILLER 11/30/2022 @ 9;00 AM

09/19/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued SUMMER MILLER 11/30/2022 @ 9;00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/30/2022 09:00; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: Robert D Sumner Judicial Cente DC Cou

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued SUMMER MILLER 11/30/2022 @ 9;00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPretrial Notice/Summons to be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase 512022SC004496SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J