Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:18:00 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS HARPER, LISA

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARPER, LISA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

HARPER, LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN, JOSEPH F

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 121718 AT 1000AM COURTROOM 2B

11/15/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 121718 AT 1000AM COURTROOM 2B

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Alias Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 012419; HARPER LISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Alias Summons Or Notice To Appear ISSD PROCESS SERVER; 031819 AT 1000AM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved LISA HARPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 121718 AT 1000AM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Case 512018SC004002SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/2/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Notice Designating Email Address FILED BY JOSEPH F ROSEN ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Event Date: 03/18/2019 10:00; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Event Date: 12/17/2018 10:00; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN , JOSEPH F