Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:32:47 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS BROOKS, HEATHER

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROOKS, HEATHER. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

BROOKS, HEATHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

 

Court Documents

Pre-Trial Conference Order

01/28/2019:Pre-Trial Conference Order

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved HEATHER BROOKS

12/06/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved HEATHER BROOKS

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 1100AM COURTROOM 2B

11/26/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 1100AM COURTROOM 2B

Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

11/06/2018:Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved HEATHER BROOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 1100AM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Case 512018SC004049SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/6/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Event Date: 01/28/2019 11:00; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ