This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 09/13/2022 at 00:12:41 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS BLACK, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLACK, ROBERT. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

BLACK, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

 

Court Documents

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/09/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Notice Of Confidential Information

08/09/2022:Notice Of Confidential Information

Civil Cover Sheet

08/09/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Statement Of Claim

08/09/2022:Statement Of Claim

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued ROBERT BLACK 09/22/2022 @ 10:00 AM

08/19/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued ROBERT BLACK 09/22/2022 @ 10:00 AM

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice

09/07/2022:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 08/09/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued ROBERT BLACK 09/22/2022 @ 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCase 512022SC003904SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/9/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ