This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 13:35:38 (UTC).

PORT RICHEY LEASED HOUSING ASS VS CORREA, JEAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 PORT RICHEY LEASED HOUSING ASS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CORREA, JEAN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORT RICHEY LEASED HOUSING ASS

Defendants

REYES, GEORGIENETTE

CORREA, JEAN

Not Classified By Court

REGENCY PALMS APARTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMILLAN, JOHN EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Default Entered GEORGIENTTE REYES AND JEAN CORREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service GEORGIENETTE REYES AND JEAN CORREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS; GEORGIENETTE REYES AND JEAN CORREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served JEAN CORREA 121918

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served GEORGIENETTE REYES 12/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; JEAN CORREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; GEORGIENETTE REYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004960CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.