This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/16/2019 at 06:02:23 (UTC).

PETTRY, AGNES BERNICE Et Al VS HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 PETTRY, AGNES BERNICE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PETTRY, RONALD

PETTRY, AGNES BERNICE

Defendant

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATHOPOULOS, TOM BILL

Defendant Attorney

KOCIOLEK, PETER W

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Form

09/05/2019:Final Disposition Form

Complaint

03/12/2019:Complaint

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To

03/12/2019:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To

Request To Produce

03/12/2019:Request To Produce

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • Motion To Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Request For Admissions TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance PETER KOCIOLEK ESQ OBO HARTFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial HARTFORD INS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Request For Production TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Case 512019CA000847CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 3/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less