This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/22/2019 at 06:00:59 (UTC).

PEREZ, CARMEN VS DECOSTA, JAMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 PEREZ, CARMEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DECOSTA, JAMES. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ, CARMEN

Defendants

DECOSTA, JAMES

R J KIELTY PLUMBING HEATING AN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEISURE, JODI

Defendant Attorney

PETRILLO, ANTHONY JUDE

 

Court Documents

Final Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice

06/01/2020:Final Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice

Motion To Compel FILED BY PLTF

07/29/2019:Motion To Compel FILED BY PLTF

Notice Of Taking Deposition

08/01/2019:Notice Of Taking Deposition

Stipulation of Dismissal

05/05/2020:Stipulation of Dismissal

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER ON JAMES DECOSTA

03/20/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER ON JAMES DECOSTA

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER ON RJ KIELTY PLUMBING, HEATING AND COOLING INC

03/20/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER ON RJ KIELTY PLUMBING, HEATING AND COOLING INC

Complaint DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/18/2019:Complaint DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Request For Admissions RJ KIELTY PLUMBING HEATING & COOLING

03/18/2019:Request For Admissions RJ KIELTY PLUMBING HEATING & COOLING

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To JAMES DECOSTA

03/18/2019:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To JAMES DECOSTA

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To RJ KIELTY PLUMBING HEATING & COOLING

03/18/2019:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To RJ KIELTY PLUMBING HEATING & COOLING

Civil Cover Sheet

03/18/2019:Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • Objection PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Objection PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Objection PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Response To Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial RJ KEILTY AND JAMES DECOSTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Request For Production TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Request For Admissions TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance ANTHONY PETRILLO ESQ OBO ALL DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • Case 512019CA000904CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 3/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Admissions RJ KIELTY PLUMBING HEATING & COOLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To JAMES DECOSTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To RJ KIELTY PLUMBING HEATING & COOLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Request To Produce JAMES DECOSTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Request To Produce RJ KIELTY PLUMBING HEATING & COOLING

    Read MoreRead Less