Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/22/2020 at 06:02:22 (UTC).

PAULSON INVESTMENTS LLC VS CRUZ, VICTOR D Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 PAULSON INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CRUZ, VICTOR D. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAULSON INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

CRUZ, VICTOR D

GULF ISLAND CONDOMINIUM OWNERS

PASCO COUNTY FLORIDA

STATE OF FLORIDA

MCBRIDE, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAFALCE, FRANK A

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR VICTOR D CRUZ

10/09/2020:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR VICTOR D CRUZ

Notice Of Lis Pendens

09/24/2020:Notice Of Lis Pendens

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

09/24/2020:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

09/24/2020:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Verified Complaint

09/22/2020:Verified Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE; 101520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served GULF ISLAND CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC 101320

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 101320 NMA VICTOR D CRUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTORNEY FOR GULF ISLAND CONDOMINIUM OWNER'S ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR STATE OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR PASCO COUNTY FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR MICHAEL MCBRIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR VICTOR D CRUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAlias or Pluries Summons to be Issued STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketExhibit EXHIBIT B MORTGAGE AND SECURITY AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketExhibit EXHIBIT A NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Possession of Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CA002166CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASCO COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAFALCE , FRANK A