This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/25/2019 at 09:31:15 (UTC).

PASIOURTIS, ANDREAS Et Al VS HARDIN, JENNIFER Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 PASIOURTIS, ANDREAS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HARDIN, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PASIOURTIS, ANDREAS

PASIOURTIS, ELIZABETH

Defendants

HARDIN, JENNIFER

UNKNOWN PARTY(S)

Not Classified By Court

PASIOURTIS, ELIZABETH C

 

Court Documents

Default Entered JENNIFER HARDIN UNKNOWN PARTY(S)

02/28/2019:Default Entered JENNIFER HARDIN UNKNOWN PARTY(S)

Motion For Default On JENNIFER HARDIN AND UNKNOWN PARTY(S)

02/26/2019:Motion For Default On JENNIFER HARDIN AND UNKNOWN PARTY(S)

Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

02/18/2019:Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

Return of Service on Summons Served JENNIFER HARDIN 021819 (POSTED)

02/21/2019:Return of Service on Summons Served JENNIFER HARDIN 021819 (POSTED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 030719 JENNIFER HARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Entered JENNIFER HARDIN UNKNOWN PARTY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion For Default On JENNIFER HARDIN AND UNKNOWN PARTY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN PARTY(S) 021819(POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service on Summons Served JENNIFER HARDIN 021819 (POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • Case 512019CC000682CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PL FOR JENNFER HARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PL FOR UNKNOWN PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.