This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 11:37:12 (UTC).

PASCO COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDI VS TONY F AND SHIRLEY MORSE LIVI

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 PASCO COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDI filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against TONY F AND SHIRLEY MORSE LIVI. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASCO COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDI

Defendant

TONY F AND SHIRLEY MORSE LIVI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMS, KATHERINE ANNE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

09/24/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

09/24/2021:Complaint

Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR FOR TONY F & SHIRLEY MORSE LIVING TRUST

10/05/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR FOR TONY F & SHIRLEY MORSE LIVING TRUST

Notice of Non Availability FILED BY PLF

11/12/2021:Notice of Non Availability FILED BY PLF

Motion (JOINT) FOR ENTRY OF AGREED JUDGMENT GRANTING PERMANENT INJUNCTION

11/18/2021:Motion (JOINT) FOR ENTRY OF AGREED JUDGMENT GRANTING PERMANENT INJUNCTION

Judgment

11/19/2021:Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (JOINT) FOR ENTRY OF AGREED JUDGMENT GRANTING PERMANENT INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Non Availability FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR FOR TONY F & SHIRLEY MORSE LIVING TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CC003752CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASCO COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMS, KATHERINE ANNE