This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 17:50:53 (UTC).

PANOBIANCO, CHRISTINE VS AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 PANOBIANCO, CHRISTINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PANOBIANCO, CHRISTINE

Defendant

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, STEPHEN R

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, FRANCIS ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

07/02/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

07/02/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Complaint

07/02/2021:Complaint

Summons Issued And Returned To AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ISSUED TO ATTY

07/27/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ISSUED TO ATTY

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

07/27/2021:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

Notice Of Service Of Process On The Insurance Comm OBO AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY 090221

09/14/2021:Notice Of Service Of Process On The Insurance Comm OBO AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY 090221

Notice Of Appearance OBO AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

09/17/2021:Notice Of Appearance OBO AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

09/17/2021:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories CHRISTINE PANOBIANCO

09/17/2021:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories CHRISTINE PANOBIANCO

Request To Produce FILED BY AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

09/17/2021:Request To Produce FILED BY AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Production from Non Party

09/21/2021:Notice of Production from Non Party

Notice Of Taking Deposition

09/21/2021:Notice Of Taking Deposition

Request For Copies FILED BY CHRISTINE PANOBIANCO

09/23/2021:Request For Copies FILED BY CHRISTINE PANOBIANCO

Request To Produce FILED BY PLTF

09/27/2021:Request To Produce FILED BY PLTF

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO DEF

09/27/2021:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO DEF

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories TO DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Copies FILED BY CHRISTINE PANOBIANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Production from Non Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories CHRISTINE PANOBIANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance OBO AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Service Of Process On The Insurance Comm OBO AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY 090221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase Progress Notes $10.00 DUE FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCopy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA001623CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, STEPHEN R