This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 12/02/2019 at 11:30:30 (UTC).

PAGANINI, DOMENIC VS KELLEHER, EILEEN

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 PAGANINI, DOMENIC filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KELLEHER, EILEEN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAGANINI, DOMENIC

Defendant

KELLEHER, EILEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRZEPIS, BRUCE EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

RILEY, BRENDAN RUSSELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment AGAINST EILEEN KELLEHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance FILED OBO EILEEN KELLEHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service EILEEN KELLEHER 110119 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing NOT ATTACHED FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCopy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY BRUCE E PREZEPIS ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address FILED BY BRUCE E PREZEPIS ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance FILED BY BRUCE E PREZEPIS ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketPetitioners Notice Of Social Security Number Confi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCase 512019DR005694DRAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENDAN RUSSELL RILEY