This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/17/2022 at 08:30:48 (UTC).

OVERMYER, LEROY VS MEINKE, SARAH Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 OVERMYER, LEROY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MEINKE, SARAH. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OVERMYER, LEROY

Defendants

PANKOW, MARK WILLIAM

MEINKE, SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUSKOUTIS, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

10/18/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint for Eviction

10/18/2022:Complaint for Eviction

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/18/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/18/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, MARK WILLIAM PANKOW

10/19/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, MARK WILLIAM PANKOW

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, SARAH MENKE

10/19/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, SARAH MENKE

Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS RETD SVD POSTED 102222 MARK W PANKOW

10/22/2022:Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS RETD SVD POSTED 102222 MARK W PANKOW

Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS RETD SVD POSTED 102222 SARAH MEINKE

10/22/2022:Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS RETD SVD POSTED 102222 SARAH MEINKE

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

11/01/2022:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

Certificate Of Mailing

11/01/2022:Certificate Of Mailing

Motion For Default On MARK PANKOW & SARAH MEINKE / CLERK

11/08/2022:Motion For Default On MARK PANKOW & SARAH MEINKE / CLERK

Default Denied MARK WILLIAM PANKOW AND SARAH MEINKE

11/16/2022:Default Denied MARK WILLIAM PANKOW AND SARAH MEINKE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Denied MARK WILLIAM PANKOW AND SARAH MEINKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On MARK PANKOW & SARAH MEINKE / CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS RETD SVD POSTED 102222 SARAH MEINKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS RETD SVD POSTED 102222 MARK W PANKOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY, SARAH MENKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY, MARK WILLIAM PANKOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Eviction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CC003951CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less